+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 651 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB43ER)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 10105510D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB43H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105510D-H1
- Read third time
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105510D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101396D
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2010: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor