+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Incorporated by Transportation (SB617-Mims) by voice vote
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 2-N)
On December 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 067844796
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 2-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2006: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor