+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989811718-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Consent to introduce (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Presented & ordered printed 989811718
- Referred to Committee on Finance