+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0177)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 177 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB428ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101158D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2020: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Scott A. Surovell
Type:
Primary Sponsor