+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB426ER)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047760832
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
March 2, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2004: Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor