+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB425ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101853D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2016: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2016: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor