+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
On April 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 145 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB424ER)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
- Passed House (93-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (18-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
February 24, 1994: Reported from Finance (18-Y 1-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor