+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 8, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/1/16
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB424ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 16105611D-H1
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB424H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105611D-H1
- Read third time
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 16105611D-H1
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 16103924D-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB424E
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103924D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2016: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2016: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor