+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100962D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
+ − Votes (4)
February 8, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
January 26, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
January 24, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor