+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 303 (effective 3/24/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
On March 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB423ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 14105133D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB423H1
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105133D-H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 14105133D-H1
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB423S1
- Amendment by Senator Wagner withdrawn
- Read second time
- Emergency clause added
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104821D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104821D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101564D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 7, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor