+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 276 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB423ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 083983300-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Communicated to House
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB423S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 083983300-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Special Subcommittee on SB423
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083246300
+ − Votes (8)
February 22, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2008: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor