+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2015 in Finance
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 20g
- Recommitted to Finance
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (22-Y 18-N)
- Previous question, not ordered (18-Y 22-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB422S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104769D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104769D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 2-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103389D
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2014: Previous question, not ordered (18-Y 22-N)
February 11, 2014: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (22-Y 18-N)
February 6, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor