+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231)
On April 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 231 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB422ER)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (17-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor