+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 699 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB420ER)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N)
- Title replaced 18107299D-H1
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107299D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB420H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107299D-H1
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18104871D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB420S1
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18104871D-S1
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101337D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
January 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor