+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB42ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD0904661 (SB42E)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Sen. Howell agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1994: Reported from Local Government w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor