+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
On April 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 512 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB419ER)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (37-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Amended by conference committee
- House substitute accepted by conference committee
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Delegates: Hargrove, Cox, Thomas
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Forbes, Martin, Howell
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 37-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of House sub. agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (12-Y 26-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (12-Y 26-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 006961476-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 006961476-H1
- Read third time
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 006961476-H1
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 005090200-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 3
On January 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 005090200
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (37-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 37-N)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (12-Y 26-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2000: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (23-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2000: Reported from P. & E. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor