+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)
On April 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 438 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB416ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time
- Read second time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed LD5737815 (SB416E)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed