+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0618)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 618 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB416ER)
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Rerras, Bolling, Houck
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Delegates: Woodrum, Bolvin, Albo
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 40-N)
- House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 022769522-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 022769522-S1
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 022769522-S1
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 027848253
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2002: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2002: VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 40-N)
February 19, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2002: Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2002: Reported from General Laws with sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor