+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB415ER)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- House substitute accepted by conference committee
- House amendments rejected by conference committee
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (36-Y 2-N)
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 33-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (61-Y 33-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- House sub. w/amds. rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Bloxom agreed to
- Engrossed by House-committee substitute with amds.
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 15-N)
- Passed House with sub. with amendments (81-Y 15-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 37-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute with amendments
- House requested conference committee
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (34-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (34-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Chichester, Colgan, Marye
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: DeBoer, Melvin, Dillard
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4383629 (SB415H1)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD7184629 (SB415S1)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed