+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Recommitted to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Pursuant to rule 20g
- Continued to 2019 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105899D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB414S1
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18105899D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104431D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources