+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/10)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB413ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 10105773D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB413H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105773D-H1
- Passed House with substitute (69-Y 24-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (69-Y 24-N)
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105773D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary and Secondary
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105354D-S2
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 10104741D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB413S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10105354D-S2
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 10104742D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102218D
+ − Votes (13)
March 10, 2010: House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N)
March 9, 2010: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (69-Y 24-N)
March 8, 2010: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
February 16, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
February 15, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2010: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor