+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in App. (11-Y 14-N)
- Reconsidered by Appropriations
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Continued to 2005 in Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 4
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 043051840-S2
- Read first time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 048227728-S1
- Amendment by Sen. Edwards agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 043051840-S2
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub. w/amd. SB413ES2
- Printed as engrossed 043051840-ES2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 048227728-S1
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 042234728
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2004: Failed to report (defeated) in App. (11-Y 14-N)
March 3, 2004: Continued to 2005 in Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Referred from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2004: Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor