+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 3-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 10
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 044939800-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB410S1
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 044939800-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 049465812
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2004: Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 3-N)
January 30, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 7-N)
January 28, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor