+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0174)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 174 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB41ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Read second time
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Claims (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Claims
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD6311681 (SB41E)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 1-N 1-A)
On January 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Fin. sub-committee: Trans/Special Grants
On January 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Claims (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 1-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor