+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (91-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB409ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/12)
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB409ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (91-Y 5-N)
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (11-Y 4-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102509D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N)
February 27, 2012: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 8, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2012: Reported from Finance (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor