+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Tabled in General Laws by voice vote
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming (Gear)
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065337732
+ − Votes (3)
January 24, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor