+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0941)
On May 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 941 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 2, 3, 5, and 15 (3-Y 92-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 4, 6-14, 16-26 (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Amendments specific and severable
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 92-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted in part
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB406ER2)
- Communicated to Governor
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB406ER)
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 067552732-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB406H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 067552732-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB406S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 061690732-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 061690732-S1
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066028732
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 92-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2006: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor