+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
On April 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB406ER)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Committee amendment #2 rejected
- Read third time
- Committee amendment #1 agreed to
- Passed House with amendments (96-Y 1-N)
- Amendment by Ms. Cunningham agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 1-N)
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 960324146-E
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Professions
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 960324146
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 1-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor