+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
- Enacted, Chapter 844 (effective 7/1/18)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB405ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB405ER)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 11-N 4-A)
- Title replaced 18107475D-H1
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (20-Y 16-N 4-A)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107475D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB405H1
- Passed House with substitute (49-Y 48-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 48-N 2-A)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107475D-H1
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 13-N 4-A)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106360D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB405S1
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Committee substitute printed 18106360D-S1
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101342D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Introduced bill reprinted 18101342D
+ − Votes (10)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
March 6, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 11-N 4-A)
March 6, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (20-Y 16-N 4-A)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 48-N 2-A)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
February 9, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 13-N 4-A)
February 7, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor