+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (9-Y 13-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 7-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 023909536
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2002: Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (9-Y 13-N)
February 12, 2002: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 7-N)
January 23, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor