+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103224D
+ − Votes (3)
January 22, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor