+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected 18105373D-S1
- Committee substitute rejected 18106893D-S2
- Floor substitute printed 18107007D-S3 (McDougle)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator McDougle agreed to 18107007D-S3
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB403S3
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18106893D-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18105373D-S1
- Incorporates SB645 (McPike)
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100739D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor