+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB402ER)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Passed House with amendments (56-Y 40-N)
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (67-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 40-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 29-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD8228673 (SB402E)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 1, 1994: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 40-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 29-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor