+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill became law, Chapter 765 (effective 7/1/99)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB401ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 981215661-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 981215661-H1
- Passed House with substitute (82-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (0-Y 40-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Receded from objection to House Sub. agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECEDE FROM OBJECTION R (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981215661-H1
- Read second time
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985322661-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985322661
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (0-Y 40-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: RECEDE FROM OBJECTION R (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 6-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor