+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Continued to 2017 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB401S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104593D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16104593D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102079D
+ − Votes (3)
January 27, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
January 25, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2016: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor