+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
On April 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB400ER)
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendments (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (96-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of House passage agreed to by House (54-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (54-Y 40-N)
- Amendment by Del. Hull ruled not germane
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (25-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 003940548
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (54-Y 40-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amds (25-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor