+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Incorporated in other legislation (SB48-Wampler)
- No action taken by Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/07/99 002298528
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2000: No action taken by Finance (23-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2000: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor