+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0577)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 577 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB4ER)
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 044837760-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB4E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 044837760
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/17/03 044837760
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2004: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2004: Reported from General Laws with amd (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor