+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106872D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB397S1
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (8-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106872D-S1
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102802D
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
February 12, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Local Government with substitute (8-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor