+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 223 (effective 7/1/12)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 5-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (87-Y 5-N)
- Reenrolled
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB396ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB396ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment rejected
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-0Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB396E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 12100986D-E
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100986D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
March 10, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 5-N)
February 21, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2012: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor