+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 740 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB396ER)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rehab sub: ABC Laws
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 067985772
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor