+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 4/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB394ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 14105287D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB394H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105287D-H1
- Read third time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14105287D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/14 14101324D
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2014: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor