+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
On April 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB393ER)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 967271801
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1996: Reported from General Laws with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor