+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229)
On April 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 229 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB393ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
- Amendment by Del. Dudley agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (89-Y 10-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (13-Y 6-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD6761665 (SB393E)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed