+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
On April 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 467 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB391ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985329661
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor