+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389)
On April 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 389 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB39ER)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982066854-E
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 982066854
- Referred to Committee on Finance