+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Rules (14-Y 1-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 980703739-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 980703739
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Rules (14-Y 1-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor