+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Continued to 2015 in General Laws by voice vote
- Read second time
- Rereferred to General Laws
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB387S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104572D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104572D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101412D
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2014: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor