+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 152 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB386ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103015D
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor