+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
On April 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB386ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Professions
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 005642500